+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/06/2013
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Allen
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Russ
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 6
- General Order
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Title restored
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Biggs (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Brooks
- First Reading
+ − Votes (4)
April 29, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6
April 8, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 3
March 26, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
March 12, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5