+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/07/2013
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1
- Amended
- General Order
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Title restored
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Murphey (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Jolley
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 30, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
April 17, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 15
March 27, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 24
March 25, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
February 26, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor