+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Failed in Committee - Transportation
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Newell
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Simpson
- Coauthored by Coates
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Thomsen (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Transportation
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Paddack
- First Reading