+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Enacting clause stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-Education
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Stanislawski
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 29
March 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2