+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Efficiency
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 12
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Allen
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Vote
March 30, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor