+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (44)
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- To Senate
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 22
- CCR adopted
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 29 Nays: 8
- CCR adopted
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by McDaniel (Jeannie)
- Title restored
- Remove as coauthor Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie)
- CCR read
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCs changed Garrison to Floyd
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCs named Sparks, David, Griffin, Treat, Yen, Garrison, Standridge
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Health
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 27
- Referred for engrossment
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Thomsen
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 16
- General Order, Amended
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10
- Backed up to General Order
- General Order, considered and deferred
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Sparks
- Measure failed: Ayes: 16 Nays: 27
- Title stricken
- General Order, Amended
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Echols (principal House author)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Sparks
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2016: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 11
March 30, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor