+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
- Title restored
- Emergency added
- General Order, Amended
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator McCortney
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5