+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Cleveland
- General Order
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Sharp
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Senator Pittman
- General Order, Considered
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative O'Donnell (principal House author)
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Treat
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 8
March 29, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
March 21, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5