+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading rescinded
- Withdrawn from Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Emergency failed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 21
- Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 21
- General Order, Considered
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Baker (principal House author)
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Stanislawski
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 2