+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Veto message read
- Vetoed 05/06/2015
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 3
- HAs adopted
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Title restored
- General Order
- Amended
- House Rule suspended
- Amended
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5
- Referred for engrossment
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Wallace (principal House author)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Jolley
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2015: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 26
April 15, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 84
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor