+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/09/2019
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
- Title restored
- Amended
- General Order
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
- Title stricken
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget
- Withdrawn from Government Efficiency Committee
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Ortega (principal House author)
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Stanislawski
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (4)
May 2, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
April 23, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 12
April 10, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 30
March 14, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3