+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 49 Nays: 39
- Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 53 Nays: 23
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Mulready
- Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 48
- General Order
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Title stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Mulready (principal House author)
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bice
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 27, 2017: House Reconsider Measure
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 23
- Absent: 22
April 27, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 39
- Absent: 10
April 25, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 48
- Absent: 12
April 17, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 8
March 22, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor