+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee sub-committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Nelson (principal House author)
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator David
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor