+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Ikley-Freeman
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Rule suspended
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 6
- Amended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Branham
- Considered
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- General Order
- Laid over
- House Rule suspended
- Amended
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Conley (principal House author)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Kidd
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 9, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
April 9, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15
March 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor