+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
- Coauthored by Lawson
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author)
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Newhouse
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 5, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor