+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Remove Representative Mize as principal House author and substitute with Representative Caldwell (Trey)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Trey)
- CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Mize (principal House author)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Hall
- First Reading
+ − Vote
April 5, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor