+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell
- General Order
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Jech
- First Reading
+ − Vote
April 1, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor