+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Murdock
- Remove as author Senator Murdock; authored by Senator Pederson
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Murdock
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 9, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 9
April 1, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor