+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2
- HAs adopted
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 2
- Amended
- House Rule suspended
- General Order
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
- General Order, Considered
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Murdock
- Remove as author Senator Murdock; authored by Senator Pederson
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Murdock
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 1, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 6
April 25, 2019: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 75
- Absent: 26
April 25, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 14
April 1, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 6
March 5, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor