+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Nelson (principal House author)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-Education
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Stanislawski
- First Reading
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor