+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 26; Ayes: 54 Nays: 33
- General Order
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Title restored
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Denney (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Sparks
- First Reading
+ − Votes (4)
April 15, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 6
April 15, 2013: House Emergency
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 33
- Absent: 14
April 2, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 6
February 27, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor