+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Simpson, Johnson (Constance)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
- Title restored
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
- Referred for engrossment
- Coauthored by Shortey
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Ivester
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Banz (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Crain
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 27, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 25
March 25, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
March 4, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4