+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Sent to Governor
- Enrolled, to House
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Turner, Biggs
- To Senate
- Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
- CCR adopted
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- CCR adopted, GCCA
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Emergency removed
- Title restored
- CCR read, GCCA
- Enacting clause restored
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Loveless
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCs named GCCA
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- General Order
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 27
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride
- Remove Representative McBride as principal House author and substitute with Representative Derby
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Newberry
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by McBride (principal House author)
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Commerce
- Withdrawn from Finance committee
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Standridge
- First Reading
+ − Votes (5)
May 23, 2013: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 84
- Absent: 17
May 21, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3
April 22, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 5
April 9, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
March 4, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2