+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1
- General Order
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
- General Order, Considered
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Cox (principal House author)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Griffin
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor