+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Albright
- HAs read
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Title restored
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bice
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
May 13, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
April 23, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 8
March 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 29
March 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor