+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/07/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0; Ayes: 88 Nays: 1
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Perryman, Cockroft, Sherrer
- General Order
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman
- CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
- Referred for engrossment
- Emergency clause restored
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Biggs (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Smalley
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 6
March 31, 2015: House Emergency
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 12