+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/14/2013
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
- General Order
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Title restored
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Pensions committee; CR filed
- Referred to Pensions
- Withdrawn from Rules committee
- Coauthored by Wesselhoft
- Remove as principal author Representative Wesselhoft and substitute with Representative McDaniel (Randy)
- Remove as author Senator Treat; authored by Senator Mazzei
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Wesselhoft (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Treat
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
May 7, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3
March 27, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 10
March 20, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 5, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3