+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Coauthored by Bell
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2
- General Order
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Taylor (principal House author)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Paxton
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Smalley
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 22, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
March 26, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
February 20, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 1