+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1
- General Order
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Hill (principal House author)
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Quinn
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 14, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 12
March 31, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor