+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/08/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 8
- General Order
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Utility and Environmental Regulation Committee
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Utility and Environmental Regulation
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Ivester
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Johnson (Constance)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by McNiel (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Energy
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Simpson
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 2, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 8
March 25, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
March 4, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3