+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Title restored
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
- General Order, Considered
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Johnson (Constance)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Ivester
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Cockroft (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Paddack
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 3, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 4
April 1, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
March 12, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 3