+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/20/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 6
- General Order
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended
- Referred for engrossment
- Title restored
- Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 12
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Echols (principal House author)
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Withdrawn from Judiciary committee
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Holt
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 13, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor