+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Floyd
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron, Lepak
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Miller
- Coauthored by Senator Kirt
- General Order, Considered
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 9
- Referred for engrossment
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author)
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator David
- Coauthored by Senator Stanley
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Garvin
- Authored by Senator Hicks
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 20, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 27
March 29, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor