+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Title stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Rules Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative ODonnell (principal House author)
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Dahm
- First Reading
+ − Vote
April 6, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor