+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary
- Withdrawn from Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
- General Order, Considered
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Bennett (John) (principal House author)
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Allen
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 22, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor