+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/15/2017
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Title restored
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Mulready (principal House author)
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Sparks
- First Reading
+ − Votes (5)
May 8, 2017: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 3
April 18, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 6
April 10, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 24
April 5, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
March 22, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor