+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/20/2015
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 17
- HAs adopted
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 38
- General Order
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
- Title restored
- Emergency removed
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 14
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Virgin (principal House author)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Sparks
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 20, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 38
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor