+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- CCR adopted
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 30 Nays: 11
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- CCR read
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Remove as author Senator Quinn; authored by Shortey
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- SCs named Quinn, Brown, Smalley, Simpson, Shortey, Wyrick, Sparks
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Remove Representative Mulready as principal House author and substitute with Representative Echols
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 20
- Emergency not considered
- Referred for engrossment
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Emergency added
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3
- Referred for engrossment
- Engrossed to House
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Sharp
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance committee; CR filed
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Mulready (principal House author)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Quinn
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
April 22, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Absent: 20
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor