+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Osburn
- Coauthored by Representative Mize
- Coauthored by Representative Miller
- General Order, Considered
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4
- Referred for engrossment
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Rosino
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
- Title stricken
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
- Title stricken
- Emergency clause stricken
- Referred to Appropriations
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Authored by Senator Pugh
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
March 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 3