+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/12/2015
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 2
- HAs adopted
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 4
- General Order
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
- Title restored
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
- Title stricken
- General Order, Amended
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Brinkley
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor