+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bice
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 17, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 84
- Absent: 17
April 10, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 30
April 1, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
February 19, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 1