+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/20/2017
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 3
- General Order
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 2
- General Order, Considered
- Coauthored by Senator Standridge
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Sykes
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Sparks
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 12, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
April 4, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
March 22, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 7