+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conferees unable to agree
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- SCs named Crain, Newberry, Jolley, Bice, Marlatt, Sparks, Matthews
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 19
- General Order
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Virgin
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 4
- General Order, Considered
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Williams (principal House author)
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Crain
- First Reading