+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/06/2014
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 15; Ayes: 49 Nays: 27
- General Order
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
- Title restored
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: .42 Nays: 2
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
- Senate Rule suspended
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by McCullough (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Newberry
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 24
March 31, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor