+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died in conference
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- SCs named Brinkley, Jolley, Barrington, Jech, Ford, Paddack, Bass
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
- General Order
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Title stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by McDaniel (Randy) (principal House author)
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Pensions committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Pensions
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Brinkley
- First Reading
+ − Vote
April 13, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Brinkley
Type:
Primary Sponsor