+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
- Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bergstrom
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 14, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 32
April 5, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9