+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Becomes law without Governor's signature 06/22/2022
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- To Senate
- CCR adopted
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 8
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Referred for enrollment
- Enrolled, to House
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On June 13, 2022 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On June 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- CCR adopted
- Emergency added
- Enacting clause restored
- Title restored
- CCR read
- Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 4
- General Order
- Amended
- Enacting clause stricken
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
- Referred for engrossment
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- HAs read
- HAs rejected, conference requested, SCs named Treat, McCortney, Thompson, Hall, Floyd
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Special Session Conference Committee
On May 26, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Calendar
On May 20, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On May 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4
- Emergency removed
- Title stricken
- General Order, Amended
- Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Direct to Calendar
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Thompson
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 13, 2022: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 10
May 20, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor