+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 11
- HAs adopted
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 13; Ayes: 83 Nays: 1
- General Order
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee
- Title restored
- Emergency added
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- General Order, Amended
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by McDaniel (Randy) (principal House author)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Pensions committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Pensions
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Mazzei
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 13, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 10
April 13, 2015: House Emergency
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor