+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
- Amended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger
- General Order
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
- General Order, Considered
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Standridge
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 86
- Absent: 15
March 31, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor