+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Cooksey (principal House author)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Newberry
- First Reading
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor